+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 175; Eff. 6/13/2016
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/19/2016 HJ 39 P. 24
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); SJ 19
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; SJ 17
- Sen. Boutin Moved Laid on Table, DIV 9Y-12N, MF; 05/12/2016; SJ 17
- Sen. Birdsell Moved Ought to Pass; 05/12/2016 SJ 17
- Refer to Interim Study, DIV. 8Y-11N, MF; 05/12/2016; SJ 17
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove HB 1482 from the Consent Calendar; 05/12/2016 SJ 17
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/12/2016; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 18
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/06/2016, Room 102, LOB, 10:30 am; SC 13
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; SJ 10
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0676h: MA RC 208-140 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 80
- Amendment #2016-0676h: AA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 80
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass HC 14 P. 48
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0676h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 10-5; RC) HC 14 P. 48
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2016-0639h: 03/01/2016 09:15 AM LOB 308
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/12/2016 02:00 PM LOB308
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 AM LOB 308
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/16/2016 09:30 AM LOB 308
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law HJ 4 P. 16
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/10/2016 08:30 AM LOB 308
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 9, 2016: OTPA
- Yeas: 208
- Nays: 140