+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 9
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 9-1; CC) HC 5 P. 11
- Executive Session: 01/10/2018 LOB 104
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 09:30 AM LOB 104
On November 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Legislative Administration HJ 1 P. 12