+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 12
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 5 P. 15
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 10:00 AM LOB 305
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 AM LOB 305
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:00 PM LOB 305
On November 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 1 P. 12
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor