+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/14/2019 HJ 5 P. 9
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 11 P. 4
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am LOB 308
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:30 pm LOB308
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Election Law HJ 2 P. 39