+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; CC); HC 19
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:15 AM LOB 307
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/18/2014 1:45 PM LOB 307
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services