+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/07/2022; Chapter 139; eff.08/06/2022
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 HJ 14
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/26/2022); SJ 13
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-1991EBA: AA VV (in recess of) 05/12/2022 HJ 13
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-1991e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/12/2022); SJ 13
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; SJ 9
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 16
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/12/2022, Room 101, LOB, 01:15 pm; SC 15
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 8
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/31/2022 HJ 9
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 21-0; RC)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 03/14/2022 01:00 pm LOB 209
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 HJ 3
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/16/2022 HJ 3
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/18/2022 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote ; 13-0)
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 02:00 pm LOB 201-203
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Transportation