+ − Actions (11)
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; CC
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 05/20/2021; SJ 16
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 24
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 04/28/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 21
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 11
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): MF VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 50
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0507h: MA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 32
- Amendment # 2021-0507h: AA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 32
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0507h (Vote 21-0; CC) HC 18 P. 15
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95885653389 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 2 P. 36