+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 135; eff. 01/01/2025
On June 19, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 43
On June 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 19
On March 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, LOB, 01:20 pm; SC 13
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 8
On March 14, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 10
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/05/2024 (Vote 17-0; CC)
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2024 10:30 am LOB 203
- Executive Session: 03/05/2024 01:00 pm LOB 203
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/20/2024 01:00 pm LOB 203
- ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am LOB 203
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 203
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 02:30 pm LOB 203
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Transportation HJ 1 P. 21
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor