+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-21; SJ 9
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0288h MA VV
- Adopt Amendment #2014-0288h (NT) AA VV
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0288h (New Title)
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0288h for (Vote 13-0; CC); HC 13
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 AM LOB 204=Continued=
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/28/2014 10:00 AM LOB 204=Recessed=
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 10:00 AM LOB 204
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety