+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0776h
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-2; RC); HC 14
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 AM LOB 304
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 11:30 AM LOB 304
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor