+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 41; Eff. 7/14/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/19/2018 HJ 13 P. 2
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); SJ 13
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; SJ 11
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; SC 15
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/13/2018, Room 103, LOB, 02:15 pm; SC 11
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 5
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 15
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 5 P. 16
- Executive Session: 01/10/2018 LOB 203
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:30 AM LOB 203
On November 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation HJ 1 P. 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor