+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 19Y-5N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; SC 19
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 100, SH, 10:45 am; SC 14
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 10
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reconsider HB 1443 (Rep. Hopper): MF DV 150-165 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0478h: MA RC 158-151 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 4
- Lay HB 1443 on Table (Rep. Burridge): MF RC 136-171 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 2
- Amendment # 2018-0478h: AA VV 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 2
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection HJ 7 P. 49
- Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): MA VV by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 125
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0478h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 9-8; RC) HC 9 P. 58
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/21/2018 LOB 208
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 10:30 AM LOB 208
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 10:30 AM LOB 208
On November 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary HJ 1 P. 11
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2018: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 24
March 15, 2018: Table
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 171
- Present/NV: 37
- Absent: 48
March 15, 2018: OTPA
- Yeas: 158
- Nays: 151
- Present/NV: 35
- Absent: 48