+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 20
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 18-2; CC) HC 14 P. 11
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education HJ 4 P. 14
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 AM LOB 205
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2016 11:30 AM LOB 207
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/11/2016 11:30 AM LOB207
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor