+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 39; Eff. 1/1/2019
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/19/2018 HJ 13 P. 2
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); SJ 13
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; SJ 11
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; SC 15
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/21/2018, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 13
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 7
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0849h: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 34
- Amendment # 2018-0849h: AA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 34
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0849h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 9 P. 19
- Executive Session: 02/27/2018 LOB 306
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2018 10:30 AM LOB 308
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2018 01:00 PM LOB 306
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 11:30 AM LOB 306
On November 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 10