+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 350; I. Sec 2 eff 11/01/2018;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2018
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2107e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2107e: AA VV 05/23/2018
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1599s (Rep. Hunt): MA VV 05/10/2018
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1599s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
- Committee Amendment # 2018-1599s, AA, VV; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1599s, 04/26/2018; SC 18
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 101, LOB, 01:15 pm; SC 13
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 7
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0782h: MA RC 312-17 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 66
- Amendment # 2018-0782h: AA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 66
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0782h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-1; RC) HC 9 P. 37
- Executive Session: 02/21/2018 LOB 302
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 AM LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 AM LOB 302
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 11:15 AM LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:15 PM LOB 302
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 01:15 PM LOB 302
On November 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 10
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 6, 2018: OTPA
- Yeas: 312
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 26
- Absent: 37