+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 8/01/2014; Chapter 0306; Section 1-5 Effective 9/30/2014. Section 9 Effective 11/1/2014. Remainder Effective 8/1/2014.
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report #1992c; Adopted, VV
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1992c; Adopted, VV; SJ 15
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report #2014-1992c; Senate Amendment, Filed
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2014; 11:00 AM; LOB 302
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Bradley, and Larsen; SJ 14
- Sen. Forrester Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; SJ 14
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Schlachman, Butler, Major, Andrew Schmidt
- Rep. Wallner moved to Non-Concur with Senate AM and request C of C; MA VV (In recess of 5/15/2014)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order HB 1415 to Call of the Chair, Without Objection, MA VV, Necessary 2/3 Vote; SJ 13
- Special Order HB 1415 to directly after lunch, Without Objection, MA, Necessary 2/3 Vote; SJ 13
- Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2014-1879s NT, AA, VV; SJ 13
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1879s NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 13
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/15/14; SC18
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/15/14, Room 103, SH, 1:00 p.m.; SC13
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA Div 282-9 (Consent Calendar)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 25 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 AM LOB 202 (Time Change)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/10/2014 10:30 AM LOB 202
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 3/6/2014 10:30 AM LOB 202
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass MA VV
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 5 (Vote 20-0; CC); HC 7
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/21/2014 3:15 PM LOB 207
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:15 PM LOB 207
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor