+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, RC 15Y-9N, === BILL KILLED ===; SJ 9
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/17/14; SC4
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/1/14, Room 103, SH, 1:45 p.m.; SC12
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Finance
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0324h MA RC 185-153
- Floor Amendment #2014-1024h (New Title) (Rep. Kurk) AF RC 157-172
- Amendment #2014-0324h(NT) AA VV
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0324h (New Title)
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0324h for Feb 19 (Vote 13-10; RC); HC 19
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/28/2014 1:00 PM LOB 210-211
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 1/23/2014 1:15 PM LOB 210-211
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM LOB 210-211
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM LOB 210-211
- Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2014: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 9
March 19, 2014: Adopt FLAM 14-1024h
- Yeas: 157
- Nays: 172
March 19, 2014: OTPA
- Yeas: 185
- Nays: 153
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor