+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/22/2024 HJ 6 P. 3
On February 12, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/07/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor