+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, RC 13Y-11N; === BILL KILLED ===; SJ 12
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/8/14; SC17
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/22/14, Room 103, SH, 1:15 p.m.; SC15
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 173-118
- Floor Amendment #2014-0969h (Rep. Infantine) AF RC 95-199
- Lay on Table (Rep. Kapler) MF RC 115-179
- Floor Amendment #2014-0969h (Rep. Infantine)
- Floor Amendment #2014-0730h AF Div 65-227
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-8; RC); HC 14
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/18/2014 2:00 PM LOB 307
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/11/2014 10:15 AM LOB 305-307
On December 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 8, 2014: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 11
March 12, 2014: Table
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 179
March 12, 2014: Adopt FLAM 14-0969h
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 199
March 12, 2014: OTP
- Yeas: 173
- Nays: 118
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor