+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 69; Eff. 7/24/2018
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); SJ 15
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/26/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; SJ 13
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; SC 17
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 14
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Finance; SJ 7
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/22/2018 HJ 5 P. 10
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 14-0; CC) HC 7 P. 8
- Executive Session: 01/25/2018 LOB 306
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 02:00 PM LOB 306
On November 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor