+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 123; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 06/25/2019
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 51
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); SJ 19
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1877e: AA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 100
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1877e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/15/2019); SJ 17
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1438s (Rep. Sykes): MA VV 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 2
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1438s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; SJ 12
- Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-1438s, AA, VV; 04/11/2019; SJ 12
- Sen. Giuda Moved to Remove HB 140 from the Consent Calendar; 04/11/2019; SJ 12
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; CC SC 17
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, LOB, 01:00 pm; SC 16
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 10
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0687h: MA VV 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 10
- Amendment # 2019-0687h: AA VV 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 10
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0687h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; CC) HC 15 P. 6
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:30 pm LOB 203
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm LOB 203
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation HJ 2 P. 39