+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; CC); HC 19
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 AM LOB 205
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 10:15 AM LOB 205
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor