+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; CC); HC 14
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/04/2014 11:00 AM LOB 308
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 11:00 AM LOB 308
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Election Law
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor