+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 793
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 15-0; CC); HC19, PG. 403
- Continued Executive Session: 2/19/2015 LOB 208
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/4/2015 12:45 PM LOB 208 ==RECESSED==
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/15/2015 10:00 AM LOB 208
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; HJ 7, PG. 118