+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 18
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/14/2024 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 9 P. 11
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:45 am LOB 307
On January 24, 2024 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 01:00 pm LOB 307
On January 22, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 01:00 pm LOB 307
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services HJ 1 P. 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor