+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 833
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 12-8; RC); HC19, PG. 413
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM LOB 302
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 8:30 AM LOB 302
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/15/2015 2:00 PM LOB 302
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 7, PG. 118
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor