+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 5/23/2014; Chapter 0023; Effective 1/01/2015
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 9
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; CC; SC14
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/26/14, Room 101, LOB, 10:00 a.m.; SC11
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-0; CC); HC 14
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/20/2014 10:00 AM LOB 303
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/11/2014 11:00 AM LOB 303
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture