+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 8, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/08/2024 HJ 4 P. 10
On January 29, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/25/2024 (Vote 16-0; CC)
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/25/2024 10:00 am LOB 203
On January 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 10:30 am LOB 301-303
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Legislative Administration HJ 1 P. 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor