+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 229-85
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Vaillancourt)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; CC); HC 13
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/11/2014 10:00 AM LOB 203
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 1:00 PM LOB 203
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Transportation
+ − Vote
March 5, 2014: ITL
- Yeas: 229
- Nays: 85