+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 9
On February 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 9 P. 6
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/20/2024 09:15 am LOB 205-207
On February 5, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/13/2024 09:45 am LOB 205-207
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 10:15 am LOB 205-207
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education HJ 1 P. 17