+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- No Pending Motion; 05/12/2016 SJ 17
- Sen. Boutin Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 05/12/2016; SJ 17
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 12Y-12N, MF; 05/12/2016; SJ 17
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/12/2016; SC 18
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 05/04/2016, Room 102, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 17
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; SJ 10
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0566h: MA DV 200-139 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 78
- Amendment #2016-0566h: AA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 78
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HC 14 P. 48
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0566h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-7; RC) HC 14 P. 48
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law HJ 4 P. 11
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 AM LOB 308
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 10:40 AM LOB308
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 12, 2016: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor