+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 7, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2345e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 49
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 337; eff. I. Sec 4 eff 7/1/24 II. Rem eff 10/1/24 HJ 16
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2345e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2163s (Rep. Moffett): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 25
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2024-2163s, AA, VV; 05/23/2024; SJ 14
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2163s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; SJ 14
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, MA; 05/22/2024 SJ 14
On May 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 20A
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 19
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 17
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 10
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/11/2024 HJ 11 P. 42
On March 26, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/26/2024 (Vote 25-0; RC) HC 14 P. 10
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 03/06/2024 01:50 pm LOB 212
On February 1, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/01/2024 HJ 3 P. 12
- Referred to Finance 02/01/2024 HJ 3 P. 12
On January 24, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/19/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 4 P. 10
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/19/2024 02:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/12/2024 01:15 pm LOB 206-208
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs HJ 1 P. 17