+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 4 P. 11
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/27/2016 HJ 10 P. 3
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/27/2016 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 3 P. 3
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/19/2016 01:00 PM LOB301
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/13/2016 02:30 PM LOB301
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor