+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 178; Eff. 8/7/2018
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/03/2018
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); SJ 17
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Vote 5-0; CC SC 18
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/28/2018, Room 102, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 13
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; SJ 7
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0584h: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 50
- Amendment # 2018-0584h: AA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 50
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0584h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; CC) HC 9 P. 28
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/14/2018 11:00 AM LOB 301
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 01:30 PM LOB 305-307
On November 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 1 P. 7