+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 08/24/2013; Chapter 0115
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, Recess of 5/29/13; HJ45, PG.1527
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate AM #1076s (Rep Porter): MA VV; HJ43, PG.1464
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1076s, MA, VV;
- Committee Amendment 1076s, AA, VV
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1076s, 3/28/13; Vote 5-0; CC; SC13
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/20/13, Room 102, LOB, 10:20 a.m.; SC12
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; SJ 6
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 17, PG.344
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 13 (Vote 11-4; RC); HC 13, PG.214
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/30/2013 10:00 AM LOB 301
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/24/2013 10:15 AM LOB 301
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; HJ 12, PG.183
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor