+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 35
On November 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 50 P. 5
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/23/2019 01:30 pm LOB 204
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am LOB 204
On August 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am LOB 204
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 06/25/2019 09:30 am LOB 204
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 06/11/2019 10:00 am LOB 204
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am LOB 204
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 10:00 am LOB 204
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/17/2019 11:00 am LOB 204
- Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:00 am LOB 204
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 2 P. 38
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor