+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 53; Effective Date 6/2/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); HJ 41, PG. 1781
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); SJ 15
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1218s (Rep Steven Smith): MA VV; HJ 41, PG. 1747
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1218s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 11
- Committee Amendment 1218s, AA, VV
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1218s, 4/9/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC16
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 103, LOB, 1:00 p.m.; SC15
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Transportation; SJ 8
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 14, PG. 275
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 4 (Vote 14-0; CC); HC10, PG. 152
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 1/28/2015 2:30 PM LOB 203
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- ==POSTPONED== Executive Session: 1/27/2015 2:30 PM LOB 203
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 1:00 PM LOB 203
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Transportation; HJ 7, PG. 118