+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 195-128 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 127
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-9; RC) HC 9 P. 51
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 AM LOB 207
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 11:25 AM LOB 207
On November 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education HJ 1 P. 7