+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0221; Sections 1-3 Effective Date 9/12/14; Remainder Effective 7/14/2014.
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report #1923c; Adopted, VV
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1923c; Adopted, VV; SJ 15
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report #2014-1923c; Senate Amendment, Filed
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/23/2014 2:30 PM LOB 204
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Boutin, and Soucy; SJ 14
- Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; SJ 14
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Rep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate AM and request C of C; MA VV (In recess of 5/15/2014)
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Shurtleff, Wallner, Chandler, Nordgren
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1776s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 13
- Committee Amendment 1776s, NT, AA, VV
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1776s, 5/15/14; Vote 5-0; CC; SC18
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 5/7/14, Room 100, SH, 9:30 a.m.; SC15
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-5;RC); HC 13
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:30 PM LOB 306
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 11:15 AM LOB 306
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor