+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 219-66
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 9-8; RC); HC 13
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 AM LOB 208
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 1:30 PM LOB 208
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary
+ − Vote
March 6, 2014: ITL
- Yeas: 219
- Nays: 66