+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; RC); HC 14
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 AM LOB 301
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 3/3/2014 1:00 PM LOB 301
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 1:00 PM LOB 301
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 1:00 PM LOB 301
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor