+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020; SJ 8
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/11/2020 HJ 7 P. 6
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 10 P. 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am LOB 302
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/03/2020 01:00 pm LOB 302
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 09:15 am LOB 302
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor