+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020 SJ 8
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 7
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 24
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 7 P. 15
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am LOB 203
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:30 pm LOB 203
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation HJ 1 P. 17