+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/31/2024; Chapter 32; eff: 01/01/2025 HJ 15
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 176
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/22/2024); SJ 15
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; SJ 10
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 15
On April 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 14
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1133h: AA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1133h: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 11
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1133h 03/20/2024 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 12 P. 7
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am LOB 305
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 01:45 pm LOB 302-304
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 15
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor