+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA Div 288-20
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 19 (Vote 17-1; RC); HC 11
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/30/2014 2:00 PM LOB 302
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 1/23/2014 2:15 PM LOB 302
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 2:30 PM LOB 302
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor