+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/26/2018; SC 18
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 100, SH, 10:00 am; SC 14
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 7
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0493h: MA VV 02/22/2018 HJ 5 P. 17
- Amendment # 2018-0493h: AA VV 02/22/2018 HJ 5 P. 17
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0493h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 20-0; RC) HC 7 P. 14
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2018 LOB 204
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2018 LOB 204
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 10:30 AM LOB 204
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 1 P. 5