+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0299; Section 1 & 2 Effective as provided in Section 5. Section 6-8 Effecive 10/1/17. Remainder Effective 9/30/2014.
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report #1988c; Adopted, Div 201-115
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1988c; Adopted, VV; SJ 15
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report #2014-1988c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED==Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2014; 9:30 AM; LOB 304
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED==Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014; 9:30 AM; LOB 304==RECESSED
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/22/2014; 3:00 PM; LOB 304
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Cataldo, and Soucy
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Butler, Schlachman, Muns, John Hunt
- Non-Concur with Senate AM and Requests C of C (Rep. Butler) MA VV
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment 1508s, NT, AA, VV
- Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2014-1595s, AA, VV
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1508s, NT, 1595, MA, RC 23Y-0N; OT3rdg; SJ 11
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1508s, NT, 5/1/14; SC16
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/15/14, Room 101, LOB, 1:00 p.m.; SC14
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0832h MA VV
- Adopt Amendment #2014-0832h AA VV
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0832h (Vote 18-0; CC); HC 14
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/04/2014 1:15 PM LOB 302
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2014 10:00 AM LOB 302
- ===CANCELLED=== Executive Session: 2/18/2014 2:00 PM LOB 302
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 9:00 AM LOB 104
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/11/2014 11:00 AM LOB 302
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
May 1, 2014: Ought to Pass with Amendment
- Yeas: 23