+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/16/2022 HJ 3
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; CC)
- Executive Session: 02/09/2022 11:30 am LOB 205-207
On January 8, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 11:30 am LOB 205-207
On November 19, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor