+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 04/20/2018; Chapter 9; Eff. 6/19/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); SJ 13
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 28
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; SJ 11
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; CC SC 15
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, LOB, 01:15 pm; SC 14
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 7
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0415h: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 52
- Amendment # 2018-0415h: AA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 52
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0415h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 9 P. 30
- Executive Session: 02/06/2018 LOB 201
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:00 AM LOB 201
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:30 AM LOB 201
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Public Works and Highways HJ 1 P. 5