+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 223; Eff. 8/8/2016
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 58
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); SJ 20
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1933s (Rep. Steven Smith): MA VV 05/19/2016 HJ 39 P. 23
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1933s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; SJ 17
- Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2016-1933s, NT, AA, VV; 05/12/2016; SJ 17
- Committee Amendment 1783s, NT, RC 7Y-17N, AF; 05/12/2016 SJ 17
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1783s, NT, 05/12/2016; SC 18
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 04/26/2016, Room 100, SH, 01:15 pm; SC 16
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 10
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 66
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 14 P. 42
- Executive Session: 02/16/2016 11:00 AM LOB 203
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Transportation HJ 4 P. 8
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 11:00 AM LOB 203
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 12, 2016: Committee Amendment 1783s
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 17